BUTTERFLY CONSERVATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The conservation of butterflies, moths and our environment
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£6,616,000
Donations and legacies | £3.00m | |
Charitable activities | £3.21m | |
Other trading activities | £105.00k | |
Investments | £307.00k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£6,824,000
Raising funds | £391.00k | |
Charitable activities | £6.43m | |
Other | £0 |
£338,000 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £242,662 from 22 government contract(s) and £869,807 from 29 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £391.00k | |
Charitable expenditure | £6.43m |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £391.00k | |
Charitable expenditure | £6.43m | |
Retained for future use | £130.00k |
People

106 Employee(s)
11 Trustee(s)
5630 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£80k to £90k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Austria
- Belarus
- Belgium
- Bulgaria
- Croatia
- Czech Republic
- Denmark
- Estonia
- Finland
- France
- Germany
- Hungary
- Iceland
- Ireland
- Italy
- Lithuania
- Luxembourg
- Macedonia
- Netherlands
- Northern Ireland
- Norway
- Poland
- Portugal
- Romania
- Russia
- Scotland
- Serbia
- Slovakia
- Slovenia
- Spain
- Sweden
- Switzerland
- Turkey
Governance
- 23 July 2010: Standard registration
- THE BRITISH BUTTERFLY CONSERVATION SOCIETY LIMITED (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Ruth Waters | Trustee | 11 November 2024 |
|
|||||
Lynnette Leeson | Trustee | 11 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Shaun Thomas | Trustee | 09 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Carrie Anne Hume | Trustee | 09 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Steve Almond | Trustee | 09 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Catrin Jayne Evans | Trustee | 04 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Martin Spray | Trustee | 12 November 2022 |
|
|||||
Dr Elaine King | Trustee | 13 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Hugh Ellerton | Trustee | 14 November 2020 |
|
|||||
Professor Laurence Harwood | Trustee | 16 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Simon Saville | Trustee | 10 November 2018 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.50m | £4.48m | £4.35m | £6.25m | £6.62m | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.88m | £4.27m | £4.27m | £5.56m | £6.82m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £193.85k | £174.67k | £169.78k | £212.10k | £242.66k | |
|
Income from government grants | £729.41k | £658.10k | £486.55k | £585.96k | £869.81k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £1.28m | £1.35m | £1.25m | £2.89m | £3.00m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £60.00k | £72.17k | £47.00k | £31.00k | £105.00k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £2.92m | £2.85m | £2.82m | £3.10m | £3.21m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £248.11k | £148.29k | £237.00k | £228.00k | £307.00k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £53.95k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £643.66k | £688.45k | £667.00k | £1.30m | £2.26m | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £4.68m | £4.02m | £4.04m | £5.27m | £6.43m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £200.15k | £249.17k | £224.00k | £289.00k | £391.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £106.44k | £141.67k | £89.00k | £113.00k | £127.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £33.00k | £16.65k | £24.66k | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £25.02k | £0 | £13.00k | £11.09k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £1.47m | £1.45m | £1.42m | £1.39m | £1.37m | |
|
Long-term investments | £4.68m | £5.30m | £5.59m | £5.28m | £5.61m | |
|
Other assets | £5.30m | £5.41m | £5.59m | £6.66m | £6.37m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £372.08k | £223.00k | £291.00k | £636.00k | £523.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 05 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 05 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 18 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 18 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 20 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 20 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 23 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 06 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 11 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 17/12/1987 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 29/11/2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 17/11/2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 29/04/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20/11/2010 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 28/05/2010 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 10/12/2014
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND FOR OTHER PURPOSES BENEFICIAL TO THE COMMUNITY; 1. THE STUDY, CONSERVATION AND PRESERVATION OF NATURAL FAUNA AND FLORA PARTICULARLY SPECIES OF BUTTERFLIES AND MOTHS IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND ELSEWHERE, BY CONSERVING THEM IN THE WILD BY SUCH MEANS AS ARE AVAILABLE INCLUDING WITHOUT LIMITATION THROUGH THE CREATION AND CONSERVATION OF NATURAL, SEMI-NATURAL OR OTHER HABITATS. 2. TO PROMOTE, UNDERTAKE AND SPONSOR SCIENTIFIC STUDY AND RESEARCH INTO THE HABITS, DISEASES AND LIFE-CYCLES OF SUCH FLORA AND FAUNA AND PARTICULARLY BUTTERFLIES AND MOTHS AND THEIR LIFE-CYCLES IN RELATION TO AGRICULTURAL, HORTICULTURAL, INDUSTRIAL AND HUMAN PRACTICES AND ACTIVITIES AND TO DISSEMINATE THE RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH AS WIDELY AS POSSIBLE. 3. TO PROMOTE OR UNDERTAKE CONSERVATION AND SOUND MANAGEMENT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC GENERALLY OF LANDS OF ECOLOGICAL OR OTHER SCIENTIFIC IMPORTANCE. 4. TO FOSTER INTEREST IN GOVERNMENTAL AND VOLUNTARY BODIES, EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENTS AND THE PUBLIC GENERALLY IN PROBLEMS CONCERNING THE CONSERVATION OF NATURAL FLORA AND FAUNA AND PARTICULARLY BUTTERFLIES AND MOTHS.
Area of benefit
THE UNITED KINGDOM AND ELSEWHERE
Linked charities
- 23 July 2010 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
BUTTERFLY CONSERVATION
MANOR YARD
SHAGGS
EAST LULWORTH
WAREHAM
BH20 5QP
- Phone:
- 01929400209
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window