BRIGHTON AND HOVE JEWISH WELFARE BOARD

Charity number: 255060
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £92.40k £82.31k £47.93k £69.88k £56.82k
Total expenditure £77.78k £72.59k £60.70k £53.16k £51.87k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A