THE WILLIAM HENRY HOFMEYER FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The relief of poor Christadelphians, preference being given to those who live within the City of Birmingham. The relief is given by making grants to appropriate charitable institutions.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Birmingham City
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 04 March 1968: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RICHARD JOHN HARRIS | Trustee | 14 October 2010 |
|
|||||
MICHAEL THOMAS WARD | Trustee | 14 October 2010 |
|
|
||||
MARK RODNEY WESTON SMITH | Trustee | 26 February 1998 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.22k | £10.43k | £10.60k | £11.07k | £11.27k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.01k | £10.16k | £10.34k | £10.90k | £10.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 12 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 21 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 29 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
COURT SCHEME OF THE 31 OCTOBER 1955
Charitable objects
FOR THE RELIEF BY THE PROVISION OF BLANKETS COAL OR BREAD OR IN SUCH OTHER MANNER, OF POOR CHRISTADELPHIANS, PREFERENCE BEING GIVEN TO ANY SUCH PERSONS LIVING WITHIN THE CITY OF BIRMINGHAM. THE TRUSTEES MAY IF THEY THINK FIT OUT OF SUCH INCOME MAKE GRANTS TO ANY CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS FOR ENABLING SUCH INSTITUTIONS TO EFFECT SUCH RELIEF AS AFORESAID.
Area of benefit
CITY OF BIRMINGHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
Chartley House
Rising Lane
Knowle
SOLIHULL
B93 0DB
- Phone:
- 01564785595
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window