CHARLOTTE ANTONIA SULIVAN FOR MISSION HALL CHARITY

Charity number: 255176
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 Overdue Overdue by 1909 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 Overdue Overdue by 1909 days
Annual return 31 December 2014 Overdue Overdue by 2275 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2014 Overdue Overdue by 2275 days
Annual return 31 December 2013 16 October 2014 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2013 21 October 2014 On time
Annual return 31 December 2012 31 October 2013 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2012 31 October 2013 On time
Annual return 31 December 2011 30 October 2012 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2011 30 October 2012 On time