HALE OLDER PEOPLE'S WELFARE COMMITTEE

Charity number: 255181
Charity reporting is overdue by 1771 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2004 31/03/2005 31/03/2006 31/03/2007 31/03/2008
Total gross income £4.65k £2.90k £7.90k £5.52k £6.58k
Total expenditure £3.01k £2.98k £6.95k £4.69k £6.55k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A