Trustees THE LONDON BUDDHIST CENTRE

Charity number: 255420
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Gus Miller Trustee 14 February 2023
None on record
Robert Luis Crow-Mains Trustee 24 May 2022
None on record
Holly Murray Trustee 14 September 2021
None on record
Dr Dayanatha Showman Trustee 14 September 2021
None on record
OLIVER BROCK Trustee 25 February 2020
None on record
Jyotismati Weiss Trustee 28 January 2020
None on record
David Waterston Trustee 29 October 2018
None on record
Claudine Edwards Trustee 03 April 2017
None on record
Sandra Turner Trustee 13 July 2015
None on record
Dr Paramabandhu Groves Trustee
FUTURE DHARMA FUND
Received: On time