AGE CONCERN (OXTED, LIMPSFIELD AND DISTRICT)

Charity number: 255446
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £7.70k £7.29k £7.04k £5.27k £5.14k
Total expenditure £5.27k £4.54k £6.42k £3.38k £1.71k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A