LEEDS THEATRE TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 255460
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2020 18 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 18 May 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2019 01 September 2020 93 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 01 September 2020 93 days late Download
Annual return 31 July 2018 15 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 15 April 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2017 27 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 27 April 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2016 03 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016 03 January 2017 On time Download