Trustees LEEDS THEATRE TRUST LIMITED
Charity number: 255460
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Bertille Calinaud | Trustee | 14 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Martin | Trustee | 01 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Laurence Kevin Brophy | Trustee | 19 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Simon Robinson | Trustee | 23 February 2022 |
|
|||||
Rozina Breen | Trustee | 01 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Pitt | Trustee | 25 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Michael Alan Nabarro | Trustee | 15 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Neil Adleman | Trustee | 26 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
CLAIRE LOWSON | Trustee | 12 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Susan Pitter | Trustee | 12 April 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.