THE ERANDA ROTHSCHILD FOUNDATION

Charity number: 255650
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2020 26 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 26 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2019 22 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 22 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2018 08 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 14 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2017 11 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 11 January 2018 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2016 03 February 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2016 03 February 2017 On time Download