THE ERANDA ROTHSCHILD FOUNDATION

Charity number: 255650
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 05/04/2016 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020
Total gross income £4.09m £5.10m £5.24m £4.81m £4.45m
Total expenditure £3.75m £2.82m £2.70m £2.17m £4.08m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £4.09m £5.10m £5.24m £4.81m £4.45m
Income - Other £467 £1.00k £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £3.33m £2.51m £2.43m £1.88m £3.79m
Expenditure - Raising funds £421.95k £311.36k £262.46k £292.54k £288.93k
Expenditure - Governance £120.05k £97.49k £0 £113.10k £142.62k
Expenditure - Grants institution £3.21m £2.41m £2.31m £1.76m £3.65m
Expenditure - Investment management £421.95k £311.36k £262.46k £292.54k £288.93k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0