THE VANDERVELL FOUNDATION

Charity number: 255651
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £259.11k £292.72k £323.09k £294.56k £232.90k
Total expenditure £418.93k £391.08k £443.76k £458.10k £440.77k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £4.85k