THE MARCONI COMPANIES CHARITABLE FUND

Charity number: 255710
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

General Charitable Purposes Relief of Poverty

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £16,367
Total expenditure: £21,370

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
  • Essex

Governance

Registration history:
  • 22 April 1968: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Investment
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
IAN MUIR Chair 25 September 2017
None on record
Gavin Bailey Trustee 28 November 2017
None on record
DARREN HOUGHTON Trustee 28 November 2017
None on record
KAREN MURRAY Trustee 06 July 2012
None on record
Julie Rock Trustee 06 July 2012
None on record
NICHOLAS JOHN BOGGON BOGGON Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £11.73k £11.92k £9.61k £14.73k £16.37k
Total expenditure £25.37k £25.18k £24.71k £21.12k £21.37k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 02 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 23 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 26 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 09 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 24 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
B A E Systems
Chelmsford Office & Technology Park
West Hanningfield Road
Great Baddow
CHELMSFORD
CM2 8HN
Phone:
03300467226
Website:

No information available