ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS NOTTINGHAMSHIRE WEST BRANCH

Charity number: 255762
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £110.99k £145.57k £117.20k £255.79k £136.15k
Total expenditure £116.81k £95.59k £102.94k £99.93k £106.36k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A