ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS NOTTINGHAM AND NOTTS BRANCH

Charity number: 255763
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 08 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 08 October 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 16 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 16 September 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 09 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 31 July 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 08 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 08 August 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 11 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 07 August 2017 On time Download