ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS NOTTINGHAM AND NOTTS BRANCH

Charity number: 255763
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Mel Twardawa Trustee 16 January 2018 None on record
Bryony Butcher Trustee 24 June 2015
ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS LINCOLNSHIRE NORTH EAST BRANCH Received: On time
Kerry Grinrod Chair 16 September 2015 None on record
Lucy Cook Trustee 15 January 2020 None on record
LOUISE ELLIS Trustee 16 August 2012 None on record
Craig Scott Trustee 25 June 2017 None on record
EMMA BALL Trustee 11 March 2013 None on record