JEMIMA CREED'S CHARITY

Charity number: 255863
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £12.84k £13.18k £13.08k £22.19k £15.05k
Total expenditure £6.29k £8.30k £11.05k £14.75k £2.99k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A