THE NINEVEH CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 256025
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2020 28 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 28 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2019 14 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 14 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2018 05 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 05 December 2018 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2017 17 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 17 October 2017 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2016 30 November 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2016 30 November 2016 On time Download