THE CHESHIRE YEOMANRY REGIMENTAL ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 256143
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 22 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 18 May 2020 108 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 18 February 2019 18 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 18 February 2019 18 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 30 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 15 December 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required