CHURCHES' LEGISLATION ADVISORY SERVICE (CLAS)

Charity number: 256303
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 30 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 30 October 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 12 November 2020 12 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 12 November 2020 12 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 07 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 07 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 05 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 05 June 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 14 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 14 September 2017 On time Download