CHURCHES' LEGISLATION ADVISORY SERVICE (CLAS)

Charity number: 256303
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £84.49k £86.89k £86.81k £88.88k £84.90k
Total expenditure £78.19k £78.12k £84.85k £75.54k £85.53k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A