Trustees TOWN LANDS

Charity number: 256465
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
CHRISTOPHER EDWARD HALL Chair 11 July 2011
None on record
Jacqueline Abbey Trustee 25 November 2020
None on record
NATASHA DREW Trustee 05 May 2016
None on record
PAT LAING Trustee 05 May 2015
None on record
ROBERT CHARLES HARRRISON Trustee 25 August 2011
None on record
KATHLEEN ANN DRAYCOTT Trustee 01 July 2011
MARY AGATE HALL TRUST FUND
Received: On time