Governing document NATIONAL BACK PAIN ASSOCIATION
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED THE 7TH AUGUST 1968 AS AMENDED ON 23RD JANUARY 1973, 23RD MARCH 1981, 15TH JUNE 1999 AND 16TH JUNE 2001
Charitable objects
TO CARRY OUT AND PROMOTE RESEARCH INTO THE CAUSES, CURE AND PREVENTION OF ILLNESS, COMPLAINTS AND DISORDERS IN OR ASSOCIATED WITH THE BACK OF THE BODY AND OTHER ALLIED CONDITIONS AND TO PUBLISH AND MAKE AVAILABLE THE RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH. THE RELIEF OF PERSONS WHO SUFFER SUCH CONDITIONS AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC CONCERNING SUCH CONDITIONS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.