Trustees ST. BARNABAS HOSPICES (SUSSEX) LTD

Charity number: 256789
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Victoria Johnson Trustee 12 November 2021
None on record
Ian Sellwood Trustee 28 September 2021
None on record
Rosalind Joan Britton Trustee 28 September 2021
None on record
MICHAEL RYMER Trustee 28 September 2021
None on record
HHJ David Rennie Trustee 28 September 2021
None on record
Lisa Kenna Trustee 22 October 2019
None on record
Stuart Palma Trustee 02 January 2019
None on record
JILL CARNIE Trustee 24 August 2018
SPRINGBOARD PROJECT
Received: 38 days late
MARTIN GODSMARK Trustee 23 January 2018
None on record
Tony Moss Trustee 23 January 2018
None on record
RUTH TAYLOR Trustee 28 February 2017
None on record
Anthony Clark Trustee 30 November 2016
LEO HOUSE CHILDREN'S HOSPICE
Received: On time