TRUST PROPERTY HELD IN CONNEXION WITH TABERNACLE WELSH CONGREGATIONAL CHAPEL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Worship of God in the Congregationalist tradition - Services, prayer meetings, bible study groups. The play groups and foodbank have not restarted since the covid lockdown.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Rhondda Cynon Taff
Governance
- 02 December 1968: Standard registration
- TABERNACLE WELSH CONGREGATIONAL CHAPEL (Working name)
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PHILIP GRAHAM JONES | Trustee | 28 July 2012 |
|
|
||||
GARETH IRFON JONES | Trustee | 24 May 1989 |
|
|
||||
JOHN EGRYN JONES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.16k | £11.95k | £10.93k | £9.61k | £57.13k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.00k | £9.19k | £8.26k | £10.54k | £10.82k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 02 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 02 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 21 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 11 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 09 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 02 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CNVEYANCE DATED 8 SEPTEMBER 1959
Charitable objects
GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE CHAPEL.
Area of benefit
YNYSYBWL
Contact information
- Address:
-
20 ROCK TERRACE
YNYSYBWL
PONTYPRIDD
CF37 3NT
- Phone:
- 01443790363
- Email:
- jonesgi21@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window