SUSSEX ORNITHOLOGICAL SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To record and study wild birds in the county of Sussex. To assist in the conservation of the wild birds of Great Britain. To engage, inspire and educate people to enjoy, appreciate and understand birds and their habitats.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

12 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Brighton And Hove
- East Sussex
- West Sussex
Governance
- 27 September 1968: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jack Thompson | Trustee | 04 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Adam Edward Huttly | Trustee | 04 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Steve Gilbert | Trustee | 10 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Charles Holt | Trustee | 13 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Susan Kerry-Bedell | Trustee | 28 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Kathleen Wilder | Trustee | 25 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Clare Buckle | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anthony John Benton | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
JONATHAN COOK | Trustee | 02 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Katie Nethercoat | Trustee | 09 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alan John Swetman | Trustee | 07 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Edwin Merrikin | Trustee | 13 April 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £49.30k | £39.36k | £35.49k | £39.23k | £76.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £35.08k | £71.91k | £30.08k | £50.43k | £62.08k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 17 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 17 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 05 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 05 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 14 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 14 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 01 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 01 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 20 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 20 April 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES as amended on 01 Apr 2023
Charitable objects
A) TO RECORD AND STUDY WILD BIRDS IN THE COUNTRY OF SUSSEX. B) TO ASSIST IN THE PRESERVATION OF WILD BIRDS IN GREAT BRITAIN. C) TO ENCOURAGE BY THE USE OR FILMS, BOOKS, MEETINGS, OUTINGS AND OTHER MEANS (I) THE STUDY OF BIRDS IN THE FIELD AND ORNITHOLOGICAL SCIENCE GENERALLY AND (II) THE EDUCATION OF ITS MEMBERS AND THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN ORNITHOLOGICAL, SCIENCE AND THE NEED FOR PROTECTION OF WILD BIRDS AND THEIR HABITATS.
Area of benefit
GREAT BRITAIN
Contact information
- Address:
-
Blessings
Barns Farm Lane
Storrington
Pulborough
RH20 4AH
- Phone:
- 01903745166
- Email:
- merrited2@gmail.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window