Accounts and annual returns DEBNEY COTTAGES

Charity number: 256950
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2022 21 July 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2021 09 May 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2020 12 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 19 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2018 09 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 Not Required