REVEREND JOHN MOSSOP'S CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Donations to the needy of the parish of St. John the Baptist, Baston
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Lincolnshire
Governance
- 18 November 1970: Standard registration
- BASTON CHARITIES (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REV Caroly Bailey | Chair | 18 January 2018 |
|
|
||||||||
Simon Charles Pitchford | Trustee | 01 February 2022 |
|
|||||||||
Eileen Mary Mort | Trustee | 18 January 2018 |
|
|||||||||
CLARE WOODS | Trustee | 18 January 2013 |
|
|||||||||
CLAIRE RICKETT | Trustee | 18 October 2012 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £265 | £249 | £188 | £513 | £404 | |
|
Total expenditure | £350 | £0 | £318 | £480 | £150 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 16 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 15 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 28 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 20 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE 19TH OCTOBER 1970
Charitable objects
THE CLEAR INCOME TO BE APPLIED IN RELIEVING EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE PARISH OF BASTON WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS, IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE PROVISIONS OF THE SCHEME
Area of benefit
PARISH OF BASTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
6 Church Street
Baston
PETERBOROUGH
PE6 9PE
- Phone:
- 01778560526
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window