Financial history THORPE ST ANDREW TRUST

Charity number: 257209
Charity reporting is overdue by 115 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/03/2018 30/03/2019 30/03/2020 30/03/2021 30/03/2022
Total gross income £11.08k £2.81k £1.83k £2.05k £645
Total expenditure £10.52k £3.81k £2.93k £3.00k £3.55k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A