Governing document GODALMING OLD PEOPLE'S WELFARE ASSOCIATION (AFFILIATED TO AGE CONCERN)
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 2ND MAY 1968 AS AMENDED ON 8TH MARCH 1972, JUNE 1978, APRIL 1979, 27TH APRIL 1983 AND 28TH OCTOBER 1987 AS AMENDED ON 24 MAR 2022 AS AMENDED ON 21 JUL 2021 AS AMENDED ON 24 MAR 2022
Charitable objects
The object of the Charity shall be to promote the welfare of older people in any manner which now is or hereafter may be deemed by law to be charitable within the Borough of Godalming (hereinafter called “the area of benefit).
Area of benefit
BOROUGH OF GODALMING
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.