AGE CONCERN NEWHAVEN DAY CLUB

Charity number: 257301
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 13 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 24 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 22 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 05 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 28 February 2017 28 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required