AGE CONCERN NEWHAVEN DAY CLUB

Charity number: 257301
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £17.48k £14.46k £14.48k £1.76k £19.05k
Total expenditure £14.99k £18.07k £1.48k £1.53k £18.76k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A