Accounts and annual returns CHARITY OF WILLIAM CHOWLES

Charity number: 257514
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 05 September 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 21 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 02 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 25 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 31 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required