Accounts and annual returns THE OLD BAPTIST CHAPEL AND TRUST PROPERTY

Charity number: 257656
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 30 September 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 10 November 2021 10 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 21 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 18 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 16 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required