Financial history MERIDEN WAR MEMORIAL TRUST

Charity number: 257703
Charity reporting is overdue by 930 days

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2004 31/12/2014 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £0 £0