BOGNOR REGIS AND DISTRICT HEBREW CONGREGATION

Charity number: 257718
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £80 £20 £140 £98 £101
Total expenditure £16 £40 £31 £93 £5
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A