Financial history CHRISTIANS IN ACTION

Charity number: 257785
Charity reporting is up to date (106 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £139.86k £138.25k £142.05k £159.59k £130.83k
Total expenditure £151.35k £135.43k £139.87k £128.31k £139.58k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A