THE HIGH WYCOMBE SOCIETY

Charity number: 257897
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 02 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 01 May 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 11 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 23 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 19 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required