THE HIGH WYCOMBE SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The High Wycombe Society was founded in 1969 to bring together people who valued our town and wanted to prevent its deterioration in the face of the development pressures that had run rampant in the 1960s. Although the bodies that manage the town are today far more mindful than their predecessors of so much that is of value in our historic town, the work of the High Wycombe Society continues.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

12 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Buckinghamshire
Governance
- 30 April 1969: Standard registration
- 27 July 2019: Funds received from 268350 PHILIP J RUTLAND CHARITY TRUST
- HIGH WYCOMBE SOCIETY (Previous name)
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stephanie Anne Osborn | Trustee | 27 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
tony mealing | Trustee | 06 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Anthony Hatton | Trustee | 10 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mollie Margaret Robinson | Trustee | 10 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Peter Strutt | Trustee | 10 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Patricia Humphreys | Trustee | 10 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
michael victor blackwell | Trustee | 14 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
william bryce reid | Trustee | 16 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
BRIAN TRANTER | Trustee | 12 November 2014 |
|
|||||
DAVID RAYMOND SNOXELL | Trustee | 16 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
Nigel John Phillips | Trustee | 16 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
Malcolm Ivor Connell | Trustee | 17 December 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.73k | £4.73k | £5.56k | £8.60k | £4.77k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.44k | £3.60k | £5.56k | £10.45k | £6.66k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 02 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 01 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 29/11/1968 AS AMENDED ON 30/04/1971 AS AMENDED ON 27/04/1973 AS AMENDED ON 16/04/1992 AS AMENDED ON 16/05/2014 as amended on 23 Mar 2018
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ("THE OBJECTS") ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN HIGH WYCOMBE AND THE SURROUNDING AREA: - TO PROMOTE THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE ENVIRONMENT, IN PARTICULAR THE PUBLIC REALM AND THE HISTORIC ENVIRONMENT; - TO ENCOURAGE HIGH STANDARDS IN THE MANAGEMENT AND DEVELOPMENT OF THE BUILT AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT; - TO PROMOTE SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT BY THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE ENVIRONMENT, AND THE PROMOTION OF THE PRUDENT USE OF RESOURCES (SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT BEING DEVELOPMENT THAT MEETS THE NEEDS OF THE PRESENT WITHOUT COMPROMISING THE ABILITY OF FUTURE GENERATIONS TO MEET THEIR OWN NEEDS); - TO FOSTER CIVIC PRIDE AND STIMULATE AND EDUCATE THE PUBLIC, IN PARTICULAR BY PROMOTING UNDERSTANDING OF THE BEAUTY, HISTORY, GEOGRAPHY AND CHARACTER OF DIFFERENT LOCALITIES; - TO DEVELOP THE CAPACITY AND SKILLS OF INDIVIDUALS AND COMMUNITIES TO UNDERSTAND AND TAKE ACTION TO CONSERVE, PROTECT AND IMPROVE THE QUALITY, BEAUTY AND CHARACTER OF THEIR LOCALITY; - TO PROMOTE SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED BY THE TRUSTEES, INCLUDING THE ASSISTANCE OF OTHER CHARITIES.
Area of benefit
HIGH WYCOMBE AND THE SURROUNDING AREA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Pann Mill
London Road
HIGH WYCOMBE
Buckinghamshire
HP11 1BJ
- Phone:
- 07724881440
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window