Governing document THE HIGH WYCOMBE SOCIETY

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 29/11/1968 AS AMENDED ON 30/04/1971 AS AMENDED ON 27/04/1973 AS AMENDED ON 16/04/1992 AS AMENDED ON 16/05/2014 as amended on 23 Mar 2018
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ("THE OBJECTS") ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN HIGH WYCOMBE AND THE SURROUNDING AREA: - TO PROMOTE THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE ENVIRONMENT, IN PARTICULAR THE PUBLIC REALM AND THE HISTORIC ENVIRONMENT; - TO ENCOURAGE HIGH STANDARDS IN THE MANAGEMENT AND DEVELOPMENT OF THE BUILT AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT; - TO PROMOTE SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT BY THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE ENVIRONMENT, AND THE PROMOTION OF THE PRUDENT USE OF RESOURCES (SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT BEING DEVELOPMENT THAT MEETS THE NEEDS OF THE PRESENT WITHOUT COMPROMISING THE ABILITY OF FUTURE GENERATIONS TO MEET THEIR OWN NEEDS); - TO FOSTER CIVIC PRIDE AND STIMULATE AND EDUCATE THE PUBLIC, IN PARTICULAR BY PROMOTING UNDERSTANDING OF THE BEAUTY, HISTORY, GEOGRAPHY AND CHARACTER OF DIFFERENT LOCALITIES; - TO DEVELOP THE CAPACITY AND SKILLS OF INDIVIDUALS AND COMMUNITIES TO UNDERSTAND AND TAKE ACTION TO CONSERVE, PROTECT AND IMPROVE THE QUALITY, BEAUTY AND CHARACTER OF THEIR LOCALITY; - TO PROMOTE SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED BY THE TRUSTEES, INCLUDING THE ASSISTANCE OF OTHER CHARITIES.
Area of benefit
HIGH WYCOMBE AND THE SURROUNDING AREA.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.