Trustees THE HIGH WYCOMBE SOCIETY
Charity number: 257897

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
COLIN ERIC HINGSTON | Chair | 14 March 2018 |
|
|||||
tony mealing | Trustee | 06 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mollie Margaret Robinson | Trustee | 10 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Peter Strutt | Trustee | 10 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Patricia Humphreys | Trustee | 10 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Anthony Hatton | Trustee | 10 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
michael victor blackwell | Trustee | 14 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
william bryce reid | Trustee | 16 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
BRIAN TRANTER | Trustee | 12 November 2014 |
|
|||||
DAVID RAYMOND SNOXELL | Trustee | 16 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
Nigel John Phillips | Trustee | 16 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
Malcolm Ivor Connell | Trustee | 17 December 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.