Accounts and annual returns LUTON, ST MARY - OLD PEOPLE'S DINNER FUND

Charity number: 258015
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 26 September 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 13 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 29 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 07 November 2019 7 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 29 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required