Financial history LUTON, ST MARY - OLD PEOPLE'S DINNER FUND

Charity number: 258015
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £130 £133 £136 £125 £145
Total expenditure £125 £50 £92 £125 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A