Financial history ST ANN'S HOSPICE

Charity number: 258085
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £12.73m £11.26m £11.83m £12.50m £14.57m
Total expenditure £11.52m £11.40m £11.86m £12.75m £12.21m
Income from government contracts £4.18m N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £2.29m
Income - Donations and legacies £5.91m £4.68m £4.77m £4.76m £4.66m
Income - Other trading activities £2.38m £2.25m £2.36m £2.71m £2.28m
Income - Charitable activities £4.23m £4.13m £4.50m £4.84m £7.52m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £210.28k £197.79k £198.30k £188.37k £105.58k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £11.11k
Income - Legacies £3.53m £2.54m £2.54m £2.49m £2.41m
Expenditure - Charitable activities £8.84m £9.04m £9.42m £10.00m £9.83m
Expenditure - Raising funds £2.68m £2.36m £2.45m £2.76m £2.38m
Expenditure - Governance £66.08k £80.82k £146.18k £120.73k £111.92k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £25.83k £25.73k £25.85k £28.23k £20.42k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0