TONYPANDY AND DISTRICT OLD AGE PENSIONERS' WELFARE ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 258087
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 10 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 22 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 03 March 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 27 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 21 February 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required