TONYPANDY AND DISTRICT OLD AGE PENSIONERS' WELFARE ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 258087
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £7.24k £7.80k £7.96k £10.40k £10.87k
Total expenditure £3.01k £3.11k £3.51k £3.65k £804
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £440 N/A