ESSEX TRUST FOR REHABILITATION AND ASSISTANCE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity has two main aimes: a) to provide assistance to offenders, ex-offenders and those at risk of offending, and their families: b) to provide education and training programmes with a view to reducing the level and likelihood of offending and re-offending.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2009
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Essex
Governance
- 16 April 1969: Standard registration
- 13 January 2010: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- E X T R A (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2005 | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | 31/08/2009 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £86.29k | £113.18k | £106.26k | £129.58k | £140.79k | |
|
Total expenditure | £101.57k | £107.21k | £130.99k | £127.34k | £97.32k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2009 | 04 January 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2009 | 04 January 2010 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | 31 January 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | 31 January 2009 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | 22 January 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | 22 January 2008 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | 30 March 2007 | 58 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | 30 March 2007 | 58 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | 07 February 2006 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | 07 February 2006 | 7 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MODEL CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 27TH FEBRUARY 1969, AS AMENDED 18 JUNE 1987 AND 21 JULY 2004
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE SOCIETY SHALL BE: (1) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TRAINING IN ORDER TO REDUCE THE LEVEL OF OFFENDING BEHAVIOUR AMONG PERSONS WHO ARE OFFENDERS, EX-OFFENDERS AND THOSE AT RISK OF OFFENDING FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE LOCAL AND WIDER COMMUNITY (2) TO PROVIDE RELIEF FROM FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AND SICKNESS FOR PERSONS WHO ARE OFFENDERS, EX-OFFENDERS AND THOSE AT RISK OF OFFENDING AND THEIR FAMILIES IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT (3) TO FURTHER AND PROMOTE THE STUDY OF AND RESEARCH INTO ALL ASPECTS AND METHODS OF THE PREVENTION OF CRIME AND DELINQUENCY AND TO OBTAIN AND MAKE RECORDS OF AND DISSEMINATE INFORMATION CONCERNING THE SAME, WITHIN THE AREA OF THE ADMINISTRATIVE COUNTY OF ESSEX.
Area of benefit
ESSEX
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window