PARKINSON'S DISEASE SOCIETY OF THE UNITED KINGDOM

Charity number: 258197
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 15 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 15 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 27 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 27 September 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 24 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 24 September 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 29 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 29 September 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 04 October 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 30 August 2016 On time Download