Financial history PARKINSON'S DISEASE SOCIETY OF THE UNITED KINGDOM

Charity number: 258197
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £32.86m £39.70m £35.16m £47.36m £36.32m
Total expenditure £30.89m £34.17m £39.09m £38.24m £28.54m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £68.73k £62.51k £107.00k £351.29k £1.62m
Income - Donations and legacies £29.63m £36.42m £31.65m £43.45m £33.07m
Income - Other trading activities £2.72m £2.85m £2.94m £2.90m £1.38m
Income - Charitable activities £167.00k £34.00k £165.00k £351.53k £1.64m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £245.00k £238.00k £275.00k £550.26k £215.00k
Income - Other £108.00k £155.00k £126.00k £106.60k £11.00k
Income - Legacies £12.36m £17.66m £14.77m £22.71m £18.64m
Expenditure - Charitable activities £24.46m £26.89m £31.22m £29.85m £21.68m
Expenditure - Raising funds £6.00m £7.28m £7.50m £8.39m £6.86m
Expenditure - Governance £383.00k £429.00k £593.00k £505.07k £423.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £5.07m £6.73m £8.25m £6.57m £4.51m
Expenditure - Investment management £48.00k £61.00k £57.00k £61.43k £56.00k
Expenditure - Other £435.00k £0 £369.00k £0 £0