PARKINSON'S DISEASE SOCIETY OF THE UNITED KINGDOM

Charity number: 258197
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Registration history:
  • 18 March 1969: Standard registration
  • 02 May 2013: Funds received from 1144167 QUIVERS AND QUAVERS
  • 28 April 2015: Funds received from 1093069 THE JAMES PARKINSON CENTRE CORNWALL
  • 09 December 2015: Funds received from 1041952 THE FAY MITCHELL MEMORIAL TRUST
  • 14 September 2020: Funds received from 1071380 JR AND SA BROOKS CHARITABLE TRUST
  • 20 October 2020: Funds received from 1080493 THE BASIL LARSEN 1999 CHARITABLE TRUST
  • 27 May 2021: Funds received from 1034615 DEEPING ST. JAMES AND DISTRICT AGRICULTURAL SHOW S...
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • PARKINSON'S UK (Working name)
  • PDS (Working name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property